Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alquilio Alvarez Diez, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Prelate of Marajó, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1919BornCarrizal, Spain
10 Oct 194425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
6 May 196545.8AppointedPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
13 Jun 196747.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Inuca in Mauretania
3 Sep 196748.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Inuca in Mauretania
26 May 197858.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Inuca in Mauretania
3 Nov 198566.3DiedPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alquilio Alvarez Diez:
Bishop Alquilio Alvarez Diez O.A.R. (born , died ) Prelate of Marajó

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013