Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María López Mauléon, O.A.R.

Prelate of Alto Xingu-Tucumã, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1955 Born
22 Aug 197621.4Temporary VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
18 Oct 198025.6ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
4 Nov 198025.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Augustinian Recollects
18 Jul 198126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
6 Nov 201964.6AppointedPrelate of Alto Xingu-Tucumã, Para, Brazil
29 Dec 201964.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Alto Xingu-Tucumã, Para, Brazil
9 Feb 202064.9InstalledPrelate of Alto Xingu-Tucumã, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jesús María López Mauléon
Bishop Jesús María López Mauléon O.A.R. (born ) Prelate of Alto Xingu-Tucumã

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMues, Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain
Ordained DeaconMarcilla
Ordained PriestMarcilla
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fortaleza, Archdiocese of Fortaleza, Ceara

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Alto Xingu-Tucumã.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2019
  • temp/od/c01: CB, 6 Nov 2019
  • i: CB, 9 Nov 2019
  • c2: CB, 17 Nov 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast