Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José del Perpetuo Socorro Alvarez Mácua, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Colybrassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1906BornDicastillo, Spain
15 Dec 192923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
5 Jun 194438.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
13 Dec 194741.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Colybrassus
1 Feb 194841.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colybrassus
30 Nov 196761.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
26 Feb 197467.9DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José del Perpetuo Socorro Alvarez Mácua:
Bishop José del Perpetuo Socorro Alvarez Mácua O.A.R. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lábrea

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 9 Feb 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013