Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Milton Corrêa Pereira

Deceased

Archbishop of Manaus, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1919BornCametá
29 Jun 194323.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 196242.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
23 Aug 196242.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
30 Sep 196242.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
4 Aug 196747.7AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
25 Apr 197353.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
25 Apr 197353.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Equilium
21 Apr 198060.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
5 Mar 198161.3AppointedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
23 May 198464.5DiedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Milton Corrêa Pereira:
Archbishop Milton Corrêa Pereira (born , died ) Archbishop of Manaus

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013