Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Carício de Gouvêa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Irecê, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1921Born
23 Jan 194422.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 198361.9AppointedBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil
8 Sep 198362.1Ordained BishopBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil
2 Mar 199472.6ResignedBishop of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil
12 Apr 200078.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Irecê, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edgar Carício de Gouvêa:
Bishop Edgar Carício de Gouvêa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Irecê

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015