Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bragança do Pará

Dioecesis Brigantiensis de Para



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luigi Ferrando, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 13 October 1981
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Belém do Pará
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Para
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 68,316 (26,387 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedebraganca.com/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 013, Praca da Catedral 368, 68600-000 Braganca, PA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (091)3425-1108
  • Fax: 3425-2018

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Gurupi
14 April 1928ErectedArchdiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Gurupi (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Guamá
3 February 1934Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Gurupi Territorial Prelature of Guamá
Diocese of Guamá
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Guamá Diocese of Guamá
Diocese of Bragança do Pará
13 October 1981Name ChangedDiocese of Guamá Diocese of Bragança do Pará
29 December 2004Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará
Diocese of Bragança do Pará
Diocese of Castanhal (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Guamá
1949127,000130,00097.7%13139,76913167ap1951
1965200,000210,00095.2%171711,76416697ap1967
1970275,000.0%21921026788ap1971
1976300,000350,00085.7%3172015,000239411ap1977
Diocese of Guamá
1980316,000354,00089.3%3192214,3633311516ap1981
Diocese of Bragança do Pará
1990571,000654,00087.3%12122423,7911210317ap1991
1999667,000724,00092.1%1872526,680917217ap2000
2000675,000733,00092.1%2172824,107818017ap2001
2001675,000733,00092.1%2373022,500818017ap2002
2002685,000743,00092.2%2362923,620618017ap2003
2003685,000743,00092.2%2373022,833718017ap2004
2004667,304942,00470.8%2272923,010717817bul:29Dec2004
2005550,627597,24992.2%2262819,665618023ap2005
2006675,000954,00070.8%2973618,750917822ap2007
2012734,0001,038,00070.7%3464018,35021210725ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013