Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel de Oliveira Soares Filho

Bishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1965 Born
28 Jun 199226.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bragança do Pará, Brazil
26 Sep 199328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bragança do Pará, Brazil
19 Dec 201853.2AppointedBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
24 Feb 201953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
10 Mar 201953.4InstalledBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel de Oliveira Soares Filho
Bishop Manoel de Oliveira Soares Filho (born ) Bishop of Palmeira dos Índios

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Domingos do Capim, Diocese of Bragança do Pará
Ordained DeaconNossa Senhora Aparecida, Church, Rondo do Pará, Diocese of Bragança do Pará
Ordained PriestSão Domingo do Capim, Diocese of Bragança do Pará
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes Dom Eliseu Maria Corolli, Bragança, Diocese of Bragança do Pará

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palmeira dos Índios.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2018
  • i/od/c0: CB, 22 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 24 Feb 2019

Quantcast