Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Maria Giambelli, B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança do Pará, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1920BornFlero, Italy
4 Jul 194323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
21 Apr 198060.1AppointedBishop of Guamá, Para, Brazil
15 Jun 198060.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guamá, Para, Brazil
10 Apr 199676.0RetiredBishop of Bragança do Pará, Para, Brazil
26 Dec 201090.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança do Pará, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel Maria Giambelli:
Bishop Miguel Maria Giambelli B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança do Pará

  • a priest for 67.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013