Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro José Conti

Bishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1949 Born
12 Jun 197626.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 199546.2AppointedBishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
18 Feb 199646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
29 Dec 200455.2AppointedBishop of Macapá, Amapa, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro José Conti
Bishop Pedro José Conti (born ) Bishop of Macapá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Macapá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,735

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018