Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentim Fagundes de Meneses, M.S.C.

Bishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1953 Born
2 Feb 197925.5ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
2 Jul 198228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Jul 202067.0AppointedBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
26 Sep 202067.1Ordained BishopBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
10 Oct 202067.2InstalledBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Valentim Fagundes de Meneses
Bishop Valentim Fagundes de Meneses M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Balsas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgualva, Diocese of Angra, Portugal
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Sagrado Coração, Church, Praça Seca, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Balsas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2020
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2020
  • i: AM, 5 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Oct 2020

Quantcast