Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Carlos Cruz Santos, M.S.C.

Bishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1961 Born
2 Feb 198826.1ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Dec 199231.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Feb 201452.2AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
10 May 201452.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
24 May 201452.4InstalledBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Carlos Cruz Santos
Bishop Antônio Carlos Cruz Santos M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Caicó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caicó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 13 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018