Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Panico, M.S.C.

Bishop of Crato, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1946 BornTricase
31 Oct 197125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
2 Jun 199347.4AppointedBishop of Oeiras-Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
14 Aug 199347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oeiras-Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
2 May 200155.3AppointedBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Panico:
Bishop Fernando Panico M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Crato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Crato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 1 Mar 2014