Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Oeiras

Dioecesis Oeirensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 27 February 2008
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Teresina
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Piaui
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 15,096 (5,830 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste IV
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedeoeiras.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Av. Prof. Rafael Farias 534, 64500-000 Oeiras, PI, Brasil
  • Telephone: (089)3462-1710
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Oeiras
16 December 1944ErectedDiocese of Piaui Diocese of Oeiras (erected)
28 October 1974Territory LostDiocese of Oeiras
Archdiocese of Teresina
Diocese of Picos (erected)
Diocese of Oeiras-Floriano
8 December 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Oeiras Diocese of Oeiras-Floriano
27 February 2008SplitDiocese of Oeiras-Floriano Diocese of Floriano
Diocese of Oeiras
Diocese of Oeiras
27 February 2008SplitDiocese of Oeiras-Floriano Diocese of Floriano
Diocese of Oeiras

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Oeiras
1950348,000350,00099.4%5569,60068ap1951
1965333,000337,46598.7%131325,615229ap1967
1968366,936369,43699.3%1451919,31262212ap1971
1976170,998171,000100.0%651115,545598ap1977
Diocese of Oeiras-Floriano
1980249,000265,00094.0%751220,75015169ap1981
1990279,000295,00094.6%1061617,43782510ap1991
1999315,000340,00092.6%1271916,57894010ap2000
2000315,000340,00092.6%1271916,57894010ap2001
2001315,000340,00092.6%1282015,75084211ap2002
2002279,396285,39697.9%2011319,0121114011ap2003
2003279,396285,27497.9%1613299,634133611ap2004
2004279,396285,27497.9%1614309,313143611ap2005
Diocese of Oeiras
2012123,000138,17789.0%221235,34711014ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013