Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Brito Guimarães

Archbishop of Palmas, Tocatins


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1954 BornBuriti
26 Jan 198631.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oeiras-Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
17 Jul 200248.4AppointedBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
14 Sep 200248.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
20 Oct 201056.7AppointedArchbishop of Palmas, Tocatins, Brazil
17 Dec 201056.8InstalledArchbishop of Palmas, Tocatins, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Brito Guimarães:
Archbishop Pedro Brito Guimarães (born ) Archbishop of Palmas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Palmas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014