Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cândido Lorenzo González, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1925Born
23 Sep 194217.0EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
10 Sep 194721.9Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
13 Jun 195125.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
6 Jun 195428.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
5 Dec 196944.2AppointedPrelate of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
5 Dec 196944.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Scardona
19 Mar 197044.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scardona
26 May 197852.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Scardona
3 Oct 198156.0AppointedBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
17 Jul 200276.8RetiredBishop of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil
17 Dec 201994.2DiedBishop Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cândido Lorenzo González
Bishop Cândido Lorenzo González O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Raimundo Nonato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGinzo de Limia, Diocese of Orense, Spain
Ordained BishopNotre Dame de la Merci, Church, Ramos
Death PlaceReginal Senador Cândido Ferraz, Hospital, Sâo Raimundo Nonato, Diocese of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui
Buried Place (Original)São Raimundo Nonato, Cathedral, São Raimundo Nonato, Diocese of São Raimundo Nonato, Piaui

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 497
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2019
  • ente/c1: CB, 18 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast