Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel Alonso Núñez, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1921Born
22 Dec 194524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
14 Jul 197150.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
14 Jul 197150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
24 Sep 197150.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicives
24 Mar 197654.7AppointedBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
2 Feb 200078.6RetiredBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
8 Mar 200381.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Abel Alonso Núñez
Bishop Abel Alonso Núñez O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Campo Maior

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRíos, Spain

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018