Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fernando Cardinal Quiroga y Palacios

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1900Born
10 Jun 192222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
25 Nov 194545.8AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
24 Mar 194646.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
4 Jun 194949.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 Jan 195352.9Elevated to Cardinal
29 Oct 195353.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
7 Dec 197171.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Quiroga y Palacios (VIAF: 52598022)
Fernando Cardinal Quiroga y Palacios (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pedro de Maceda, Diocese of Orense
Ordained PriestCompostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Ordained BishopGran Promesa del Sagrado Corazón, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Death PlaceSan Pedro, Hospital, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid
Buried Place (Original)Pórtico de la Gloria, Cathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,946, Number 21
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jan 1953

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast