Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Nóvoa Fuente

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Titular Bishop of Chytri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1901Born
19 Apr 192422.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 195654.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
9 Apr 195654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Chytri
29 Jun 195654.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chytri
20 May 196664.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Nóvoa Fuente
Bishop Miguel Nóvoa Fuente (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Maria de Rendar

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018