Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón López Carrozas, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1937Born
10 Apr 196022.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
26 Apr 197941.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
26 Apr 197941.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
27 May 197941.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
1 Mar 198951.5AppointedBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil
15 Jan 201476.3RetiredBishop of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil
28 Apr 201880.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ramón López Carrozas
Bishop Ramón López Carrozas O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarría, Spain
Death PlaceHospital Universitario da Universidade Federal do Piaui, Teresina, Archdiocese of Teresina, Piaui
Buried Place (Original)Nossa Senhora das Merces, Cathedral, Bom Jesus, Diocese of Bom Jesus do Gurguéia, Piaui

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2014
  • d: CB, 28 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast