Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Elias Olazar Muruaga, C.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yurimaguas

Titular Bishop of Prusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1912BornLibano de Arrieta, Spain
15 Sep 193522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
11 Dec 195240.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón, Peru
11 Dec 195240.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusa
12 Apr 195340.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusa
31 Aug 195744.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón, Peru
25 Mar 197259.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru
26 Feb 197663.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yurimaguas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Elias Olazar Muruaga:
Bishop Gregorio Elias Olazar Muruaga C.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Yurimaguas

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013