Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Cerviño Cerviño

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tui-Vigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1920BornAldán
6 Apr 194625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
4 Jun 196847.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
4 Jun 196847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Benepota
28 Jul 196847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benepota
8 Nov 197656.2AppointedBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain
7 Jun 199675.8RetiredBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain
18 Apr 201291.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Tui-Vigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Cerviño Cerviño:
Bishop José Cerviño Cerviño (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tui-Vigo

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013