Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Expedito Lopes

Deceased

Bishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1914BornMarouca
30 Oct 193824.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 194834.1AppointedBishop of Oeiras, Brazil
12 Dec 194834.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oeiras, Brazil
24 Aug 195440.1AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
1 Jul 195743.0DiedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Expedito Lopes:
Bishop Francisco Expedito Lopes (born , died ) Bishop of Garanhuns

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013