Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Tupinambá da Frota

Deceased

Bishop of Sobral, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1882BornSobral
29 Oct 190523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
24 Jan 191633.4AppointedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
29 Jun 191633.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
15 Aug 191633.9InstalledBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
6 Apr 192340.6AppointedBishop of Uberaba, Brazil
10 Mar 192441.5AppointedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
25 Sep 195977.0DiedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Tupinambá da Frota:
Bishop José Tupinambá da Frota (born , died ) Bishop of Sobral

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013