Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Pedro Paglia, M.S.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1937 Born
29 Jun 196326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
3 Jul 197942.2AppointedPrelate of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
7 Sep 197942.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
16 Oct 197942.5AppointedBishop of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil
17 Oct 201275.5RetiredBishop of Pinheiro, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Pedro Paglia
Bishop Ricardo Pedro Paglia M.S.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pinheiro

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonte Serrada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinheiro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018