Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Paulo Koop, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1905Born
10 Aug 193024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
27 Jul 196458.8AppointedBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 Sep 196459.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Oct 198075.1RetiredBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Mar 198882.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Paulo Koop
Bishop Pedro Paulo Koop M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lins

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHillegom, Netherlands

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018