Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaime Vieira Rocha

Archbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1947 BornTangará
1 Feb 197527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
29 Nov 199548.6AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
6 Jan 199648.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
16 Feb 200557.8AppointedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
21 Dec 201164.7AppointedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime Vieira Rocha:
Archbishop Jaime Vieira Rocha (born ) Archbishop of Natal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Natal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,643
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015