Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Assis Dantas de Lucena

Bishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1963 Born
21 Jul 199127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
28 May 200844.6AppointedBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
17 Aug 200844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
31 Aug 200844.8InstalledBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
13 Jul 201652.7AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Assis Dantas de Lucena
Bishop Francisco de Assis Dantas de Lucena (born ) Bishop of Nazaré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJardim do Seridó

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nazaré.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2008
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,948
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018