Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manoel Delson Pedreira da Cruz, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Paraíba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1954 Born
17 Jan 197823.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Jul 198025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Jul 200651.9AppointedBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
24 Sep 200652.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caicó, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
8 Aug 201258.0AppointedBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
8 Mar 201762.6AppointedArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil
20 May 201762.8InstalledArchbishop of Paraíba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel Delson Pedreira da Cruz
Archbishop Manoel Delson Pedreira da Cruz O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Paraíba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiritinga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Paraíba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2006
  • ob: CB
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,248
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2017
  • i: CB, 8 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017