Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Aldemiro Sena dos Santos

Bishop-Elect of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1964 Born
20 Dec 199228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
4 Oct 201753.2AppointedBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
17 Dec 201753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
2 Feb 201853.6InstalledBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aldemiro Sena dos Santos
Father Aldemiro Sena dos Santos (born ) Bishop-Elect of Guarabira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuarabira, Archdiocese of Paraíba
Ordained BishopSão Sebastião, Cathedral, Ilhéus, Diocese of Ilhéus, Bahia

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Guarabira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2017
  • ob: CB, 4 Oct 2017
  • c2+: CB, 2 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 4 Nov 2017