Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Itamar Navildo Vian, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Feira de Santana, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1940 BornRoca Sales
1 Dec 196828.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Dec 198343.3AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
8 Apr 198443.6Ordained BishopBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
22 Feb 199554.4AppointedBishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil
16 Jan 200261.3AppointedArchbishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil
18 Nov 201575.2RetiredArchbishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Itamar Navildo Vian:
Archbishop Itamar Navildo Vian O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Feira de Santana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Feira de Santana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015