Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Flávio Cappio, O.F.M.

Bishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1946 Born
19 Dec 197125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Apr 199750.5AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
6 Jul 199750.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Flávio Cappio
Bishop Luís Flávio Cappio O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Barra (do Rio Grande)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuaratinguetá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,031
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018