Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diamantino Prata de Carvalho, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Campanha, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1940 BornManteigas
10 Dec 197232.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 199857.3AppointedBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 May 199857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Nov 201575.0RetiredBishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Diamantino Prata de Carvalho
Bishop Diamantino Prata de Carvalho O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Campanha

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campanha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,272
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Jul 2016