Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilherme Porto

Bishop Emeritus of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1942 Born
7 Aug 196624.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 199856.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Oct 199856.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Oct 199957.7SucceededBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Sep 201775.6RetiredBishop of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Guilherme Porto (VIAF: 43218050)
Bishop Guilherme Porto (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sete Lagoas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConceição do Rio Verde
Ordained BishopGinásio Coberto de Sete Lagoas, Sete Lagoas, Diocese of Sete Lagoas, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sete Lagoas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,444
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018