Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albino Mamede Cleto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1935BornManteigas
15 Aug 195924.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 198247.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
6 Dec 198247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Illiberi
22 Jan 198347.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illiberi
29 Oct 199762.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
24 Mar 200166.0SucceededBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
28 Apr 201176.1RetiredBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
15 Jun 201277.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Albino Mamede Cleto:
Bishop Albino Mamede Cleto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coimbra

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 16 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015