Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António José de Souza Barroso

Deceased

Bishop of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1854Born
20 Sep 187924.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 189136.2AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
1 Jun 189136.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
5 Jul 189136.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria
11 Oct 189742.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
23 May 189944.5AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
31 Aug 191863.8DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António José de Souza Barroso (VIAF: 40430037)
Bishop António José de Souza Barroso (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRemelhe, Archdiocese of Braga
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 306, and Page 465
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 551
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017