Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastião Leite de Vasconcellos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beja, Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1852Born
15 Nov 187422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
7 Dec 190755.5SelectedBishop of Beja, Portugal
19 Dec 190755.6ConfirmedBishop of Beja, Portugal
2 Feb 190855.7Ordained BishopBishop of Beja, Portugal
15 Dec 191967.6ResignedBishop of Beja, Portugal
15 Dec 191967.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
29 Jan 192370.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Beja, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Leite de Vasconcellos
Archbishop Sebastião Leite de Vasconcellos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beja

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,114
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018