Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernesto Cozzi

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Albania

Titular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1870Born
12 Nov 192050.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Albania
16 Dec 192050.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
27 Dec 192050.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
23 Feb 192655.6DiedApostolic Delegate to Albania

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Cozzi
Archbishop Ernesto Cozzi (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Albania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,920, Number 80
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast