Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ramón Pérez y Rodríguez

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1868Born
19 Sep 189123.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 192052.4AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
28 Nov 192052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
7 Jan 192960.8AppointedBishop of Spain, Military
7 Jan 192960.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
30 Jun 193062.2AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
12 Apr 193365.0AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
28 Jan 193768.8DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Pérez y Rodríguez
Patriarch Ramón Pérez y Rodríguez (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMecina Fondalez

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast