Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Correia de Bastos Pina

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1830BornCarregosa
19 Nov 185424.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 187141.0SelectedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
22 Dec 187141.1ConfirmedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 May 187241.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
19 Nov 191383.0DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Correia de Bastos Pina:
Bishop Manuel Correia de Bastos Pina (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,096
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 214

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013