Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Baptista da Costa (da Cunha)

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1843Born
11 Jun 187027.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188845.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
1 Jun 188845.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
15 Jul 188845.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
1 Feb 189955.7SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
23 May 189956.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
13 May 191370.0DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Baptista da Costa (da Cunha)
Archbishop Manuel Baptista da Costa (da Cunha) (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParadela, Diocese of Coimbra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 156, and Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017