Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1844Born
22 Sep 186622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 186723.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 189752.5AppointedBishop of Macau, China
29 Aug 189752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
10 Apr 190257.5SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
9 Jun 190257.7ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
24 Apr 190459.6DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Manuel de Carvalho
Bishop José Manuel de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTourigo, Diocese of Viseu
Ordained BishopSt. Nicolas, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 358
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 56
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast