Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Paulino de Azevedo e Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Macau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1852BornLages do Pico, Portugal
1879²26.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 190250.3SelectedBishop of Macau, China
9 Jun 190250.3ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
27 Dec 190250.9Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
17 Feb 191866.0DiedBishop of Macau, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Paulino de Azevedo e Castro:
Bishop João Paulino de Azevedo e Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Macau

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 71
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013