Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Dias Correia de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1830Born
10 Jun 185423.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 187140.4SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
26 Jun 187140.5ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
3 Sep 187140.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
12 Jul 188352.5SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
9 Aug 188352.6ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
2 Jul 191180.5DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Dias Correia de Carvalho
Bishop José Dias Correia de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCannellas, Archdiocese of Braga
Ordained BishopS. Domingo, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 313, and Page 593
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017