Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Vieira de Matos

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1861BornPeso da Regoa
22 Sep 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189938.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
22 Jun 189938.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
15 Aug 189938.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mitylene
12 Mar 190342.0SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Guarda, Portugal
2 Apr 190342.0ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Guarda, Portugal
1 Oct 191453.5AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
28 Sep 193271.5DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Vieira de Matos:
Archbishop Manuel Vieira de Matos (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 257, and Page 388
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013