Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lopes Leite de Faria

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1876BornTagilde
19 Dec 189620.6Ordained PriestPriest of Braga, Portugal
5 Oct 191539.4AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
30 Jan 191639.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
23 Aug 192751.3DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Lopes Leite de Faria:
Bishop José Lopes Leite de Faria (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013