Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Alves Feijo, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1816Born
22 Dec 183822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
26 Jul 186549.5SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
25 Sep 186549.7ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
12 Nov 186549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
25 Feb 187155.1SelectedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
5 May 187155.3ConfirmedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
7 Nov 187458.8DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Luis Alves Feijo
Bishop José Luis Alves Feijo O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFreixo de Espada Ciutra, Diocese of Bragança e Miranda
Ordained BishopS. Dominique, Church, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,093
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157, and Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017