Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Perairo (Pereira) Botelho do Amaral y Pimentel

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1815Born
25 May 185034.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 186550.1SelectedBishop of Macau, China
8 Jan 186650.4ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
30 Nov 187156.3SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
22 Dec 187156.4ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
28 Apr 187256.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
27 Jan 188973.5DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João Perairo (Pereira) Botelho do Amaral y Pimentel (VIAF: 99328991)
Bishop João Perairo (Pereira) Botelho do Amaral y Pimentel (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlerios, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopSernache
Death PlaceAngra, Diocese of Angra

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,872, Number 57
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast