Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lino de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1803Born
14 May 182622.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 186360.2AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
28 Feb 186460.4Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
1 Jul 187167.7ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
14 Dec 188582.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for José Lino de Oliveira
Bishop José Lino de Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Angola e Congo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017