Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Gomes de Almeida

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal

Note/Previous Titular See: Teja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1836Born
2 Jun 186023.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 187134.6AppointedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
21 Jan 187235.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
22 Sep 187942.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goa, India
22 Sep 187942.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
12 Jul 188346.6SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
9 Aug 188346.7ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
3 Jan 190366.1DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Gomes de Almeida
Bishop Tommaso Gomes de Almeida (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelloes, Diocese of Aveiro
Ordained BishopS. Sacrement, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,095
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103, and Page 257
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 539
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017