Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrício Xavier de Moura

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1800BornSetúbal, Portugal
9 Feb 182322.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 184847.8SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
11 Dec 184848.4ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
10 Jun 184948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
11 Dec 185858.4SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
15 Apr 185958.7ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
19 Sep 187272.1DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Patrício Xavier de Moura:
Bishop Patrício Xavier de Moura (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,229
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 278, and Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013